U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 27, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 22, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • March 19, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 04, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2016
  • April 23, 2016: [Forfeiture]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 29, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
  • February 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Forfeiture]
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Consent]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 01, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2015: [Request]
  • September 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.