U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 26, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 07, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2015: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 01, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 16, 2015: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 12, 2015: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 02, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.