U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steffens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 03, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2015: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 30, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 25, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 19, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 19, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Indictment]
  • October 07, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.