U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gallardo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extend]
  • August 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 27, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 26, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 21, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 07, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 07, 2019: [Court Reporter Information]
  • February 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Response]
  • March 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [For Order]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 05, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Acquittal]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 18, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 17, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 17, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 16, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • January 16, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 29, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • December 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 19, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Objection]
  • July 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 15, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 23, 2016: [Objection]
  • September 19, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 31, 2016: [Verdict]
  • August 31, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 31, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2016: [Response to Jury Question]
  • August 31, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • August 31, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 30, 2016: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 30, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2016: [Jury List]
  • August 29, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 29, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2016: [Request]
  • August 19, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 19, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 18, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Request]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • March 04, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 04, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 03, 2016: [Extend]
  • March 02, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Response]
  • February 26, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 03, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 21, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.