U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 08, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Verdict]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response to Jury Question]
  • July 08, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response]
  • July 08, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 08, 2016: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 07, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 06, 2016: [Jury List]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 05, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 01, 2016: [Witness List]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 28, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • June 27, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 27, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 16, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 15, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Evaluation]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 30, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 21, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 21, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 21, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 21, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2015: [Request]
  • October 20, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 20, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.