U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 06, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 22, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 17, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Request for Warrant]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 01, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2015: [Request]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 26, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2015: [Request]
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.