U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-10040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Antelope et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 23, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 29, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 16, 2018: [Extend]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 27, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 02, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 12, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 29, 2016: [Extend]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 17, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 15, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 22, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 15, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 14, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 11, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Request]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Request]
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 11, 2015: [Request]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 09, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2015: [Request]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.