U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 16, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • June 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2016: [Extend]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Competency Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2015: [Competency Evaluation]
  • December 29, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 29, 2015: [Continue]
  • December 29, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2015: [Bail Report]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2015: [Request]
  • November 12, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.