U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Redwater
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 16, 2016: [Furlough]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2016: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • August 22, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Request for Warrant]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 19, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 04, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 03, 2015: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • December 03, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 03, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.