U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrisette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 23, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 27, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 29, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Variance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Forfeiture]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 13, 2015: [Consent]
  • November 13, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 13, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 03, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 03, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 02, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Request]
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 22, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.