U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aroche-Escobar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2015: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Response]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2015: [Request]
  • October 27, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 27, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 27, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2015: [Interpreter Needed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.