U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jealous of Him
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 29, 2022: [Furlough]
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 15, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2016: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • December 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 28, 2016: [Furlough]
  • November 18, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 19, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Furlough]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 17, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2015: [Reconsideration]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Request]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 26, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 26, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.