U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shoulders
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • August 20, 2019: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 07, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 13, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 31, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 31, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 13, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Request]
  • June 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2015: [Consent]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2015: [Arrest]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.