U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 17, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • April 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 22, 2016: [Furlough]
  • April 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 01, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Reconsideration]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 23, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.