U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bald Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 09, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order for Psychiatric Examination]
  • May 17, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Furlough]
  • March 30, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 21, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • October 02, 2017: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 04, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 04, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 04, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 04, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 25, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 24, 2015: [Furlough]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 18, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 18, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 13, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2015: [Waiver]
  • November 05, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Request]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.