U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ladeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • December 07, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 06, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 30, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Request]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 31, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.