U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 19, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 13, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 29, 2019: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 29, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 13, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 13, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 15, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Order]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Disclosure ]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2017: [Request]
  • April 27, 2017: [Produce ]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 21, 2017: [Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2016: [Continue]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 09, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 09, 2015: [Arrest]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.