U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Wolf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 07, 2016: [Extend]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.