U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tallman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 14, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • March 07, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 03, 2016: [Consent]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Request]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 05, 2016: [Arrest]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.