U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Raleigh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Witness List]
  • September 23, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 13, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Departure]
  • September 07, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 30, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2015: [Request]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Request]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 21, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 21, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • October 21, 2015: [Seal Case]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.