U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pickner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 16, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2017: [Leave to]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 09, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 09, 2016: [Status Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2016: [Waiver]
  • February 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • February 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2016: [Extend]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Response]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 30, 2015: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2015: [Request]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 23, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 22, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.