U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Wolf, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 24, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 03, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Request]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 29, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 21, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.