U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 27, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.