U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wells
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 24, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 16, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 17, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.