U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dorian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 30, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 03, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 17, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 23, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.