U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thunder Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 20, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • August 03, 2016: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • February 24, 2016: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Furlough]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 30, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 30, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 29, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.