U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-40109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hulscher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 11, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 28, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2015: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.