U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 31, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 31, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 15, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 31, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.