U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berberich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 23, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Variance]
  • May 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 03, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Response]
  • November 10, 2015: [Request]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 05, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 05, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.