U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vanderkolk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 02, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 09, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request]
  • July 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.