U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holloway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 20, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 02, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2016: [Request]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 20, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.