U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crerand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 08, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 09, 2015: [Discovery]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 05, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 05, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.