U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez-Escobar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Response]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2015: [Request]
  • November 18, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 17, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Interpreter Needed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.