U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arana-Rapalo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Waiver]
  • November 09, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.