U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haggerty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Remark]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response]
  • August 23, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 17, 2016: [Joinder]
  • August 17, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
  • July 25, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 04, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 03, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.