U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 23, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2016: [Request]
  • December 23, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 01, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.