U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shangreaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Response]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 15, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • June 26, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • June 23, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 23, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 23, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 20, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 05, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 30, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 03, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 03, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 03, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 30, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 29, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • December 29, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 29, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 28, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2016: [Response]
  • December 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 27, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2016: [Text Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 14, 2016: [For Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 12, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 12, 2016: [Subpoena Issued]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 08, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • December 08, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 08, 2016: [Response]
  • December 08, 2016: [Subpoena(s)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 07, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 05, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 05, 2016: [Compel ]
  • December 02, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Brief]
  • November 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 28, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • November 28, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 23, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 21, 2016: [Request]
  • November 15, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • November 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 03, 2016: [Jury List]
  • November 03, 2016: [Request]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • October 28, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 29, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 28, 2016: [Furlough]
  • July 27, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 16, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Furlough]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 17, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 06, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 05, 2015: [Request]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 05, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 05, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.