U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hess et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • August 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 11, 2019: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • July 11, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 26, 2019: [Request]
  • June 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 19, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 13, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 10, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 10, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 09, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 05, 2017: [Mail Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 19, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2017: [Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 30, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 02, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 24, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 23, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 19, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • November 05, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 04, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 03, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 03, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.