U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haukaas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Request]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • September 20, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 15, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 01, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 27, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Furlough]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Furlough]
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • February 09, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 03, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order of Detention]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 18, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 06, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 05, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.