U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-10044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lovato
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 16, 2016: [Transcript Redaction Request]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 14, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 22, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Variance]
  • July 27, 2016: [Departure]
  • July 26, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 29, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Produce ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 19, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2015: [Response]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2015: [Request]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 10, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 10, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2015: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.