U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chauncey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 26, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 03, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 17, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2017: [Forfeiture]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 16, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 31, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2016: [Consent]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2016: [Consent]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2015: [Request]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 20, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 20, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.