U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 31, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Extend]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2015: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 03, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order]
  • November 27, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bond Forfeiture Hearing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 24, 2015: [1 - Ex Parte Docket Entry AND Document]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order for Warrant]
  • November 17, 2015: [Request]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2015: [Request]
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 13, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.