U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brings Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 31, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • May 31, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2016: [Consent]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 11, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 10, 2015: [Request]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 17, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Request]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Request]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.