U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wolf Black
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 12, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 12, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 12, 2015: [Request]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 10, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.