U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 13, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 12, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.