U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 21, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 25, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Reconsideration]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 01, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 24, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 17, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 15, 2017: [Furlough]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 24, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 15, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 31, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 31, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Ex Parte Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 30, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 11, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 08, 2015: [Request]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 13, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2015: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.