U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-50057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • February 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 13, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 09, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2016: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.