U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sogge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Brief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 02, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Variance]
  • April 18, 2016: [For Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Continue]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 15, 2015: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 04, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 04, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.