U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Takes War Bonnett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 18, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [Request]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.