U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shangreaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 13, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 23, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 31, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 31, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 19, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.